We are trying to make the calculation faster than doing from long and traditional ones. Practice and thorough learning of some values can help the candidates in cracking Quantitative Aptitude/Numerical Ability Section in Bank Exam, SSC Exam, Railway and Other Exam.

We have come up with some Time Saving Methods in Multiplications, which will make your calculations more speedy and faster.

As we know that 5=10/2. Multiply the figure given by 10 and then divide it by 2.

It is considered as a very simple method. The adoption of this method saves 5 seconds. If one adopts such methods at a number of places in the entire exam. It will save even 4 to 5 minutes that helps you attempt at least 115 more questions. This itself may make all the difference to your chances of selection.

Similarly, We know 25=100/4. So multiply the figure given by 100 and divide it by 4.

We know 125=1000/8. So multiply the figure given by 1000 and divide it by 8.

It can be treated as multiplication by 10+1, 20+1, 30+1, etc..

It can be treated as multiplication by (20 - 1), (30-1), (40-1) etc...

(jagranjosh.com)

We have come up with some Time Saving Methods in Multiplications, which will make your calculations more speedy and faster.

**Multiplication by 5, 25 & 125****1. For multiplication by 5**As we know that 5=10/2. Multiply the figure given by 10 and then divide it by 2.

**For example**: 3568 x 5 = 35680/2 = 17840.It is considered as a very simple method. The adoption of this method saves 5 seconds. If one adopts such methods at a number of places in the entire exam. It will save even 4 to 5 minutes that helps you attempt at least 115 more questions. This itself may make all the difference to your chances of selection.

**2. For multiplication by 25**Similarly, We know 25=100/4. So multiply the figure given by 100 and divide it by 4.

**For Example**3568 x 25 = 356800/4=89200.**3. For multiplication by 125**We know 125=1000/8. So multiply the figure given by 1000 and divide it by 8.

**For Example**3568 x 125 = 3568000/8 = 446000. Alternatively, if we write 125 as 100 + 25, it is correct. So, multiplication by 125 can be treated as multiplication by 100 and add to this figure one- fourth of itself (because 25 is one-fourth of 100).**4. For multiplication by 11, 21, 31 etc**It can be treated as multiplication by 10+1, 20+1, 30+1, etc..

**For Example**3568 × 11 3568 X (10+1) = 39248**5. Multiplication by 19, 29, 39 etc**It can be treated as multiplication by (20 - 1), (30-1), (40-1) etc...

**For Example**3568 x 19 = 3568 x 20 – 3568 = 67792(jagranjosh.com)